MD HB568 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a motor vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from committing specified acts relating to motor vehicle pricing; requiring a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch to ensure that any advertisement it directs to consumers relating to rebate and sales incentive claims meets specified requirements; prohibiting a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from taking specified punitive or retaliatory actions against specified persons; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2015-02-19 | House | Reassigned to Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
2015-02-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Discrimination
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Unfair Trade Practices
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Discrimination
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Unfair Trade Practices
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration