MD HB565 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, in Baltimore City, a person from selling or offering for sale any vehicle, the use of which is prohibited in Baltimore City under any State or local law; and establishing a penalty.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Unlawful Vehicles
Sponsors
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Keiffer Mitchell [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] | Del. Shawn Tarrant [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-07 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m. |
2013-02-15 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous