MD HB564 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Limiting to bottled water, low-fat milk, or 100% fruit juice the types of beverages that a restaurant may include in the price of a children's menu of meal options or a meal that is represented as a child's meal; and authorizing a restaurant to offer any nonalcoholic beverage to minors for a charge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2016-03-07HouseHearing cancelled
2016-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-10HouseHearing cancelled
2016-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-03HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback