MD HB562 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the license fee for a special Chesapeake Bay and coastal sport fishing license for nonresident license applicants from $50 to $100.
Title
Special Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License - Nonresidents - License Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-8) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-32) |
2024-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m. |
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB507 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Residency
Sports and Recreation
Coastal Bays
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Residency
Sports and Recreation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 745 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |