MD HB561 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors to provide notice by electronic mail or regular mail of a member vacancy to specified persons; and requiring a specified notice to include information regarding the type of member vacancy, the qualifications for the vacancy, and an explanation of the process for applying for the vacancy.
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Notice of Member Vacancies
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433 |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {166782/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Associations
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Health Occupations
Morticians
Notices
Postal Service
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Health Occupations
Morticians
Notices
Postal Service