MD HB56 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from accessing utility data information recorded by a smart meter in the course of an investigation from certain utility companies without a certain search warrant.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Utility Meters
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2018-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-10-20 | House | Pre-filed |