MD HB559 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the law clinic of a law school at a constituent institution of the University System of Maryland from participating in litigation opposing, contesting, or seeking judicial review of an act, a decision, or a determination of a State agency, department, or board.
Title
University System of Maryland - Law School Clinics - Prohibited Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations |