MD HB558 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the requirements for submission of certain photographs by certain applicants for a for-hire driver's license to the Public Service Commission; requiring certain applicants for a for-hire driver's license to allow the Commission access to photographs through the Motor Vehicle Administration; requiring certain applicants to provide photographs in a format that the Commission specifies; repealing the requirement for certain applicants for a Baltimore City taxicab license to have completed a certain course; etc.
Title
For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269 |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-22 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-20 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB429 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
For-Hire Driving
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Photography
Public Service Commission
Records
Ridesharing
Utility Regulation
For-Hire Driving
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Photography
Public Service Commission
Records
Ridesharing
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 10 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 10 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 1127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 22 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |