MD HB557 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-4)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-18 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-18 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing specified State income tax rate bracket thresholds for taxable years after 2013 by a specified cost-of-living adjustment; etc.
Title
Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index Adjustments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |