MD HB556 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the frequency, from annual to once every 2 years, with which specified officers of the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists must be elected; altering specified qualifications for a specified license; altering specified requirements for applying for a specified license; altering specified education requirements for qualification to take a specified examination; authorizing the Board to waive a specified examination requirement if the applicant is recognized as outstanding in the field of environmental health; etc.
Title
State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94 |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {146485/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Environmental Health
Examinations
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Records
Education
Environmental Health
Examinations
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Records