MD HB555 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the scope of specified provisions of law that establish specified requirements for the disposal of wastewater by an operator of a semipermanent food service facility that operates in Anne Arundel County; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Semipermanent Food Service Facilities - Wastewater Disposal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {366483/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |