MD HB552 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, with specified exceptions, specified attachment points above which a medical stop-loss insurer assumes specified liability for losses incurred by an insured; applying the altered attachment points to renewal of a policy or contract of medical stop-loss insurance; requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to conduct a study of the use of medical stop-loss insurance in self-funded employer health plans and to submit specified reports to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Miller) {533021/1 Rejected (49-85) (Y: 49 N: 85 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Miller) {513629/1 Rejected (49-80) (Y: 49 N: 80 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {103624/1 Rejected (51-78) (Y: 51 N: 78 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Fisher) {863420/1 Rejected (52-83) (Y: 52 N: 83 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Miller) {533021/1 Rejected (49-85) (Y: 49 N: 85 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Miller) {513629/1 Rejected (49-80) (Y: 49 N: 80 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {103624/1 Rejected (51-78) (Y: 51 N: 78 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Fisher) {863420/1 Rejected (52-83) (Y: 52 N: 83 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-15) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Hearing 4/13 at 9:00 a.m. |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2015-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-49) |
2015-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate W. Miller) {533021/1 Rejected (49-85) |
2015-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate W. Miller) {513629/1 Rejected (49-80) |
2015-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {103624/1 Rejected (51-78) |
2015-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {863420/1 Rejected (52-83) |
2015-04-08 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Fisher) Adopted |
2015-04-07 | House | Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Fisher) Adopted |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {206582/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Claims
Contracts
Disabilities
Disclosure
Discrimination
Diseases
Domestic Violence
Genetics
Health
Health Insurance
Hearings
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Liability
Mental Health
Prices
Reports
Small Business
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Claims
Contracts
Disabilities
Disclosure
Discrimination
Diseases
Domestic Violence
Genetics
Health
Health Insurance
Hearings
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Liability
Mental Health
Prices
Reports
Small Business
Substance Abuse
Sunset