MD HB550 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Comptroller to grant a Class 9 limited distillery license to the holder of an on-premises consumption permit; authorizing a local licensing board that does not issue a certain license to grant an on-premises and off-premises consumption permit; authorizing a holder of the permit to sell products the applicant produces for off-premises consumption and mixed drinks made from liquor that the holder produces and other ingredients for on-premises consumption; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 9 Limited Distillery License - On-Premises Consumption Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {603196/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Comptroller
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Comptroller
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales