MD HB55 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain licensed real estate broker, licensed associate real estate broker, or licensed real estate salesperson to provide a voter registration application and information on registering to vote in the local jurisdiction to a client on the date of closing, under certain circumstances; and providing that a certain violation is not subject to a general penalty provision.
Title
Business Occupations – Obligations of Real Estate Brokers – Voter Registration
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-08-24 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Business Regulation and Occupations
Elections
Licenses
Real Estate
Real Property
Registration
Voting
Business Regulation and Occupations
Elections
Licenses
Real Estate
Real Property
Registration
Voting