MD HB55 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of aviation gasoline for purposes of the motor fuel tax; providing that "aviation gasoline" is gasoline that is used to propel gasoline-powered aircraft and does not include gasoline used to propel a motor vehicle; etc.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238 |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-30 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {859131/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-02-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-10-14 | House | Pre-filed |