MD HB549 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the holder of a Class 1 distillery license to sell mixed drinks made from liquor manufactured by the license holder and other nonalcoholic ingredients for on-premises consumption; authorizing a local licensing board to grant an on-site consumption permit to the holder of a Class 1 distillery license; prohibiting the holder from using more than an aggregate of 7,750 gallons annually of liquor the holder produces for certain mixed drinks; authorizing a local licensing board to establish and charge a permit fee; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery License - On-Site Consumption Permit
Sponsors
Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-8) (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/8 (Senator Kramer) Rejected (7-35) (Y: 7 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-8) (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/8 (Senator Kramer) Rejected (7-35) (Y: 7 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665 |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-8) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Kramer) Rejected (7-35) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {284534/1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Kramer) Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {284534/1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {533993/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of