MD HB549 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring video lottery operation licensees to provide specified notices to obligors who win specified prizes and who owe restitution; requiring video lottery operation licensees to make specified payments, withhold specified amounts, honor specified requests in a specified order, and transfer specified amounts under specified circumstances; authorizing specified obligors to appeal specified proposed transfers; etc.
Title
Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Restitution Payments
Sponsors
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. James Proctor [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] |
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93 |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appeals
Criminal Law - Procedure
Debt Collection
Gaming
Liability
Notices
Restitution
Appeals
Criminal Law - Procedure
Debt Collection
Gaming
Liability
Notices
Restitution