MD HB548 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county board of education to administer the early learning assessment to enrolled prekindergarten students in the county; authorizing the assessment to be administered to a specified student for the purpose of identifying a disability; and requiring a county board to consult with prekindergarten teachers, including teachers nominated by the exclusive bargaining representative, in determining how to implement the assessment.
Title
Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {295769/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Counties
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Students
Auditors and Audits
Counties
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Students