MD HB547 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 247
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Children's Service Animal Program in the Maryland Department of Health to serve the needs of children with a history of trauma, post-traumatic stress disorder, or who have been diagnosed with a certain disability and special health care need by teaching them to partner with a service or support dog or to interact with therapy horses; requiring the Department to select at least one nonprofit entity to select Program participants, support dogs, or therapy horses, and facilitate training or therapy; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 247
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-12SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2020-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {306581/1 Adopted
2020-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB455 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 248

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General134101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134102(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134103(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134104(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134105(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General134106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback