MD HB547 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the vehicle emissions control program, at the time of a vehicle's biennial emissions test and inspection, to provide for specified additional inspections of the vehicle's tires, exterior lights, and windshield wipers; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration and the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations that define the inspection parameters and establish a schedule for the additional inspection of vehicle tires, exterior lights, and windshield wipers; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles - Tires, Exterior Lights, and Windshield Wipers - Biennial Inspection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-22HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2016-02-16HouseHearing cancelled
2016-02-18HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-03HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback