MD HB547 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2009 to change the name of a specified grantee to the Mayor and City Council of the City of Bowie; extending the deadline for the grantee to present evidence that a matching fund will be provided; requiring that the Board of Public Works expend or encumber the proceeds of the loan by June 1, 2013; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2009 - Prince George's County -

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-11 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
2011-02-09 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-08 First Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback