MD HB547 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, beginning January 1, 2022, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program from including a frequency limitation on dental prophylaxis care or oral health exams that requires the dental prophylaxis care or oral health exams to be provided at an interval greater than 120 days within a plan year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
2021-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2021-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-26SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-03-02SenateReferred Finance
2021-02-26HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2021-02-25HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-23HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB485 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General15103(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback