MD HB542 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual authorized by a clerk of a circuit court to perform a marriage ceremony in the State; establishing that the authority of a specified individual to perform a marriage ceremony expires at a specified time; and authorizing the Court of Appeals to adopt rules to implement the Act.
Title
Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2014-02-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading Judiciary |