MD HB541 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a contract for the sale of single-family residential real property in Montgomery County to contain a notice that school boundaries designated for the property may be subject to change; and establishing that a certain contract may not be voided under certain circumstances.
Title
Montgomery County – Residential Property Sales – School District Information MC 01-21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-18) |
2021-03-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Contracts
Montgomery County
Notices
Public Schools
Real Estate
Real Property
Residential Property
Contracts
Montgomery County
Notices
Public Schools
Real Estate
Real Property
Residential Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 10 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |