MD HB54 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the use, management, and, subject to Board of Public Works approval, ownership of certain lands created or formed by excavation materials in Sinepuxent, Isle of Wight, and Chincoteague bays from the Department of the Environment to the Department of Natural Resources; and repealing certain approval authority of the Board over the use and management of certain lands created or formed by excavation materials in Sinepuxent, Isle of Wight, and Chincoteague bays.
Title
Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Coastal Bays
Dredging
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Land Patents
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Ocean City
Recordation
Titles
Water
Worcester County
Dredging
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Land Patents
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Ocean City
Recordation
Titles
Water
Worcester County