MD HB539 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim May 25 as Missing Children Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-14HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-21HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-14HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-26HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback