MD HB539 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring individuals who apply to register to vote after June 30, 2017, to submit proof of United States citizenship; providing that individuals who are not citizens of the United States are not qualified to be registered voters; requiring an applicant for voter registration to submit specified documents or information to prove United States citizenship; etc.
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Ballots
Drivers' Licenses
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Ethnic Affairs
Identification
Immigrants and Citizenship
Notices
Postal Service
Records
Vital Records
Voting
Drivers' Licenses
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Ethnic Affairs
Identification
Immigrants and Citizenship
Notices
Postal Service
Records
Vital Records
Voting