MD HB538 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in St. Mary's County a beauty salon beer and wine license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to a person who holds a beauty salon permit; authorizing a holder of the license to sell or serve not more than specified amounts of beer and wine for on-premises consumption by a beauty salon customer under specified circumstances; establishing a $300 license fee; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2017-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Cosmetologists
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Retail Sales
St. Mary's County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Cosmetologists
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Retail Sales
St. Mary's County