MD HB536 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to adopt regulations that may be applied when a national or public health emergency that affects the State is issued by the President of the United States or the Secretary of Health and is based on a serious health threat resulting from the existence of a certain deadly agent; and requiring that a carrier that issues Medicare supplement policies establish a special enrollment period for individuals enrolled in Medicare Part B and the Maryland Medical Assistance Program.
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority - Federal Health Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-10) |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-01 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {593521/1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
COVID-19
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Insurance Administration
Medical Assistance
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Insurance Administration
Medical Assistance
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials