MD HB534 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of provisions of law related to notice of the service on a respondent of specified protective orders; and repealing obsolete provisions relating to a specified contingency.
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489 |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Clerks of Court
District Courts
Family Law
Law Enforcement
Notices
Protection Orders
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Sunset
District Courts
Family Law
Law Enforcement
Notices
Protection Orders
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Sunset