MD HB53 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Codifying the Maryland Statewide Independent Living Council as an instrumentality of the State to submit, monitor, implement, and evaluate the State Plan under the federal Rehabilitation Act in conjunction with Centers for Independent Living in the State; and requiring the Attorney General to be the legal advisor to the Council.
Title
Human Services - Maryland Statewide Independent Living Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {793121/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2022-09-09 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB608 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Subjects
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabled
Open Government
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Social Services - Generally
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabled
Open Government
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Social Services - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 7 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 7 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 7 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 7 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 7 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 7 | 1006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 7 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |