MD HB53 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person other than the candidate or the candidate's spouse from making a loan to the campaign finance entity of a candidate; etc.
Title
Election Law - Private Loan to Campaign Finance Entity of Candidate - Prohibited
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-11-02 | House | Pre-filed |