MD HB53 | 2016 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rescinding the State's consent to enter into the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote and repealing the statutory provisions reciting the Agreement; repealing specified provisions of law relating to the nomination of presidential electors; specifying that presidential electors in the State are elected at large by the voters of the entire State; specifying that presidential electors cast their votes for the candidates who receive a plurality of the votes cast in the State; etc.
Title
Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-01-27 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-01-20 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-07-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB53 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Subjects
Elections
Federal Government
Interstate Affairs
Legislative Services, Department of
Political Candidates
Voting
Federal Government
Interstate Affairs
Legislative Services, Department of
Political Candidates
Voting