MD HB53 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the clerk of a circuit court may charge a reasonable fee set by the State Court Administrator and not to exceed $60 for recording an affidavit of affixation or an affidavit of severance for a manufactured home.
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2015-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {882317/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-01-19 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Fees
Land Records
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Real Property
Recordation
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Fees
Land Records
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Real Property
Recordation