MD HB53 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement for obtaining an exemption from the payment of tuition at community colleges for specified disabled individuals who are enrolled in classes for continuing education instruction designed to lead to employment.
Title
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Disabled Individuals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments 835660/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/2 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-13 | First Reading Ways and Means |