MD HB53 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified requirements for the adoption of specified regulations by the Department of the Environment; establishing requirements of septage haulers; establishing an Oversight Committee on Sewage Sludge Utilization; requiring the Department to review specified fees; authorizing the Department to reduce the fees under specified circumstances; authorizing the Department to make specified reimbursements from the Bay Restoration Fund; etc.
Title
Environment - Sewage Sludge Utilization Permit - Septage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2009-11-11 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fees
Licenses
Public Works
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Transportation
Trucks
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fees
Licenses
Public Works
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Transportation
Trucks
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0053.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0053f.pdf |