MD HB527 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the Maryland Technology Internship Program to include certain technology-based internships with units of State and local governments; requiring that at least 50% of the internships supported by the Program each year be with businesses of 150 employees or less; establishing requirements for a unit of State or local government to participate in the Program; providing for reimbursement of up to 50% of a stipend paid to an intern; authorizing certain maximum reimbursement amounts under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364 |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {874232/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {574863/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Apprentices
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Education
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Notices
Reimbursement Rates
Small Business
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Apprentices
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Education
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Notices
Reimbursement Rates
Small Business
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Work, Labor and Employment