MD HB527 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Harford County Department of Public Works to provide each affected customer with written notice of the intention of the Department to install smart water meters; establishing a process by which a specified customer will be deemed to have given permission to the Department to install a smart water meter on the customer's premises; requiring the Department to pay to a customer $500 if the Department installs a smart water meter on the customer's premises without permission; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Harford County - Department of Public Works - Smart Water Meters
Sponsors
Del. Glen Glass [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2016-02-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Counties - Local Laws
Diseases
Equipment
Fees
Harford County
Notices
Public Works
Utilities
Water
Counties - Local Laws
Diseases
Equipment
Fees
Harford County
Notices
Public Works
Utilities
Water