MD HB522 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems to conduct a study regarding the location of automated external defibrillators, the costs associated with owning, using, and training individuals to use automated external defibrillators, and potential liability issues; requiring the study to include any relevant data available for calendar years 2015, 2016, and 2017; requiring the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems to report its findings to the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35 |
2017-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {416786/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Data
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment
Food
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Inspections
Public Health
Reports
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures
Data
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment
Food
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Inspections
Public Health
Reports
Restaurants
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Weights and Measures