MD HB522 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the rights of a subscriber for shares of stock of a corporation; providing that an individual, whether or not then a director, may assent to an action by a consent that will be effective at a future time under specified circumstances; providing that a person, whether or not then a stockholder, may assent to an action by a consent that will be effective at a future date that is no later than 60 days after the consent is delivered to the corporation or its agent; etc.
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {383099/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Mergers and Acquisitions
Real Estate Investment Trusts
Securities
Corporations and Associations
Mergers and Acquisitions
Real Estate Investment Trusts
Securities