MD HB520 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county or municipality to conduct a third-party audit of certain sexual assault cases; requiring a county or municipality to arrange a third-party audit of sexual assault cases when the percentage of unfounded sexual assault cases exceeds by 5% or more a certain national average; establishing the requirements for a third-party audit of sexual assault cases; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to establish and maintain guidelines for third-party audits of sexual assault cases; etc.
Title
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {714866/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Counties
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Records
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Auditors and Audits
Counties
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Records
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses