MD HB515 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB416
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Department of Education to adopt regulations to incorporate active shooter safety drills or trainings in the annual schedule of drills for local school systems; requiring local school systems to take certain actions regarding active shooter safety drills or trainings, including collecting and reporting certain data to the Maryland Center for School Safety, and providing certain notice to parents, students, and school personnel; requiring the Center to identify best practices for active shooter safety drills; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Active Shooter Safety Drills or Trainings - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {203925/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-01 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB515 (Carry Over) 2023-03-21 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disabilities
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Guns
Higher Education
Human Rights
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
State Police, Department of
Students
studies
Teachers
Time
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disabilities
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Guns
Higher Education
Human Rights
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Administration
State Police, Department of
Students
studies
Teachers
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |