MD HB515 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring specified hospitals to establish a specified substance use treatment program; providing that the purpose of the program is to identify patients in need of substance use treatment and, if appropriate, admit the patient or, if admission is not required, to direct the patient to an outpatient treatment setting; requiring specified hospitals to operate or contract to operate specified substance use treatment units or to refer specified patients to a specified treatment unit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals - Establishment of Substance Use Treatment Program - Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-17HouseHearing canceled
2017-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback