MD HB513 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the distribution of revenue from civil fines collected through the use of work zone speed control systems; altering the highways on which a work zone speed control system may be used; clarifying that a system operator does not need to be present when a work zone speed control system is in use; altering the maximum penalty for a civil citation issued as a result of an image from a work zone speed control system; requiring the State Highway Administration to make a certain report; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Revisions (Maryland Road Worker Protection Act of 2024)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 963121/1 Adopted (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Floor Amendment 473221/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 95 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-03-08 - House - Floor Amendment 223822/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 963121/1 Adopted (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - Floor Amendment 473221/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 95 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-03-08 - House - Floor Amendment 223822/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-10) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {963121/1 Adopted (37-10) |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-36) |
2024-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report {963121/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Folden and Sydnor) |
2024-04-08 | House | Senate Refuses Recede |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Folden and Sydnor) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2024-04-08 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, Boyce and T. Morgan) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2024-04-08 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, Boyce and T. Morgan) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2024-04-05 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-10) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {523822/1 Adopted |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-38) |
2024-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-08 | House | Floor Amendment {473221/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (37-95) |
2024-03-08 | House | Floor Amendment {223822/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (39-95) |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted |
2024-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {333223/1 Adopted |
2024-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB479 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Boundaries
Citations
Data
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pilot Programs
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
studies
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Citations
Data
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Operation
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pilot Programs
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
studies
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 12 | 118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |