MD HB511 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "soil conditioner" to include the digestate produced by anaerobic digestion for purposes of the Maryland Commercial Fertilizer Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Commercial Fertilizer Law - Definition of Soil Conditioner - Alteration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback