MD HB511 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date by which St. Mary's County may file its annual financial report for the fiscal year with the Department of Legislative Services.
Title
St. Mary's County - Annual Financial Report - Filing Date
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-09 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-02-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-04 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading Environmental Matters |