MD HB51 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $1,000,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Education of Anne Arundel County for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the athletic field house and concession stand at Glen Burnie High School, located in Anne Arundel County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Glen Burnie High School Field House and Athletic Complex
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Ned Carey [D] | Del. Mark Chang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-10-20 | House | Pre-filed |