MD HB51 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination date from July 1, 2015, to July 1, 2020, of a specified increase in the surcharge on specified recordable instruments that the State Court Administrator is required to establish for the Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund.
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-13) (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-40) (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-40) (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487 |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-40) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {704464/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-26 | House | Reassigned to Appropriations |
2015-01-19 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Fees
Land Records
Real Property
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Fees
Land Records
Real Property
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset