MD HB51 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating obsolete language by authorizing a specified organization to obtain a specified license from the County Council of Dorchester County under specified circumstances; updating obsolete language by requiring the County Council of Dorchester County to pay a license fee for a Class C beer, wine and liquor license to the mayor and city council of a city or town, or requiring the Council to pay the fee to the Finance Department of Dorchester County, depending on where the organization is located; etc.
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Beer, Wine and Liquor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 314339/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-04-01 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-13 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boats and Ships
Country Clubs
County Councils
Dorchester County
Fees
Nonprofit Organizations
Veterans
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boats and Ships
Country Clubs
County Councils
Dorchester County
Fees
Nonprofit Organizations
Veterans