MD HB509 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring institutions of higher education that receive State funds to provide specified information to students regarding their education loans; requiring the education loan information to be provided annually with a specified notice; providing that the information may be included in a student's financial aid award notice; providing that specified information may include a specified statement; prohibiting an institution of higher education from incurring a specified liability, under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-12) (Y: 125 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-12) (Y: 119 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 658
2017-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2017-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (125-12)
2017-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2017-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2017-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {914531/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (119-12)
2017-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {954865/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2017-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0509&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0509f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0509t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0509e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_658_hb0509e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0509_95486501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0509_91453101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0509.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0509_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0509_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0509,h-0742&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0509,s-1132&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0509,h-1383&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback